MO HB1249 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to municipal courts
Title
Modifies provisions relating to municipal courts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - House - House: HB 1249 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 123 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-09 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 30, 2018, 2:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2018-04-18 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-04-17 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 123 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-17 | House | Taken Up |
2018-04-10 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted |
2018-04-10 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To - relating to municipal courts |
2018-04-10 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |