MO HB1247 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the month of November as "Diabetes Awareness Month" in Missouri.
Title
Designates the month of November as "Diabetes Awareness Month" in Missouri.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House: HB 1247 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Returned to Committee of Origin (S) - General Laws |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass Consent |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wedmesdau, March 7, 2018, 12:00pm, SCR 1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S) |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-21 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 138 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-02-21 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-07 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-17 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |