MO HB124 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Patients First Medicaid Reform Act"
Title
Establishes the "Patients First Medicaid Reform Act"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB124&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0282H.01I.pdf |