MO HB124 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-03 - Referred: Select Committee on Social Services(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-03 - Referred: Select Committee on Social Services(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health and Senior Services to create a video that contains all of the information that must be provided to a woman considering an abortion
Title
Requires the Department of Health and Senior Services to create a video that contains all of the information that must be provided to a woman considering an abortion
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Black [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-03 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Social Services(H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred: Children and Families(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB124&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0124I.PDF |