MO HB1232 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions for write-in and independent candidates.
Title
Modifies provisions for write-in and independent candidates.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Stacy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-10 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |