MO HB123 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows public officials to use campaign funds for childcare costs incurred while campaigning or performing official duties
Title
Allows public officials to use campaign funds for childcare costs incurred while campaigning or performing official duties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |