MO HB1225 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding the Self-Service Storage Facilities Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding the Self-Service Storage Facilities Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-10HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2014-07-10HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2014-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2014-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2014-05-16HouseHouse Message (H)
2014-05-16HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 135 NOES: 11
2014-05-16HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 133 NOES: 12
2014-05-16HouseTaken Up
2014-05-15SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS
2014-05-15SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 29
2014-05-15SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2014-05-15SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2014-05-15SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2014-05-13SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2014-04-28SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2014-04-15SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2014-04-10SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - April 15, 2014, 12:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1
2014-04-03SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S)
2014-03-31HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2014-03-27HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 111 NOES: 29
2014-03-27HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2014-03-25HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - ha 1 adopted
2014-03-25HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2014-03-25HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-03-06HouseRules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-03-06HouseRules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-03-06HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2014-02-27HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2014-02-27HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-02-10HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-02-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-02-05HouseAction Postponed (H)
2014-02-05HouseExecutive Session Continued
2014-01-22HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2014-01-09HouseReferred: Special Standing Committee on Small Business(H)
2014-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2014-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2014-01-07HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback