MO HB1215 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the State Highway Patrol to host a website where the public can determine whether a serial number of a firearm has been reported stolen

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the State Highway Patrol to host a website where the public can determine whether a serial number of a firearm has been reported stolen

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-07HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-05-07HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-05-02HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2019-05-02HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-01HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-05-01HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-04-30HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-04-18HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2019-03-01HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback