MO HB1212 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to "Bryce's Law."
Title
Modifies provisions relating to "Bryce's Law."
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Stacy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-16 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-16 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2019-03-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |