MO HB1212 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes an advisory committee to investigate possibility of giving motor vehicle operators the option of replacing a vehicle's front license plate with a bumper sticker to be placed on front of the vehicle
Title
Establishes an advisory committee to investigate possibility of giving motor vehicle operators the option of replacing a vehicle's front license plate with a bumper sticker to be placed on front of the vehicle
Sponsors
Rep. Bart Korman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-04-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2017-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |