MO HB1205 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the "US Navy FA Paul Akers Jr Memorial Bridge" in Pulaski County
Title
Designates the "US Navy FA Paul Akers Jr Memorial Bridge" in Pulaski County
Sponsors
Rep. Don Mayhew [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |