MO HB1204 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Missouri Cybersecurity Commission"
Title
Establishes the "Missouri Cybersecurity Commission"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House: HB 1204 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-11 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 11, 9:00 a.m., SCR 2 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-22 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-20 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-04-20 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-04-20 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-20 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Homeland Security(H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |