MO HB1204 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Preserving Freedom from Unwarranted Surveillance Act that prohibits the use of drones or other unmanned aircrafts to gather evidence or other information with specified exceptions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Preserving Freedom from Unwarranted Surveillance Act that prohibits the use of drones or other unmanned aircrafts to gather evidence or other information with specified exceptions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-07SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2014-05-06SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2014-04-29SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2014-04-29SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2014-04-28SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 29, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Committee Room 1
2014-03-27SenateSecond read and referred: Senate General Laws(S)
2014-03-24HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2014-03-24HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 44
2014-03-24HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2014-03-11HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 TO HA 1, HA 1 AS AMENDED, HA 2, HA 3 ADOPTED
2014-03-11HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2014-03-11HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-02-13HouseRules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-02-13HouseRules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-02-13HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2014-02-03HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2014-02-03HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-01-30HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-01-30HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-01-23HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2014-01-09HouseReferred: Downsizing State Government(H)
2014-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2014-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2014-01-03HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback