MO HB1202 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Second read and referred: Small Business and Industry(S)
Pending: Senate Small Business and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding state contracts, taxation, non-compete agreements, and the Department of Economic Development

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding state contracts, taxation, non-compete agreements, and the Department of Economic Development

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - House - House: HB 1202 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 85 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: HB 1202 HBs PERFECTION (Y: 99 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateSecond read and referred: Small Business and Industry(S)
2021-05-03HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2021-05-03HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 85 NOES: 69 PRESENT: 0
2021-05-03HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2021-05-03HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2021-05-03HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2021-05-03HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-05-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-04-29HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2021-04-28HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 1 as amended, HSA 1 for HA 2 Adopted
2021-04-28HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2021-04-28HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2021-04-28HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2021-04-28HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2021-04-12HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-03-25HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-25HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-25HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-09HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-03-09HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-08HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-04HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-02-25HouseReferred: Economic Development(H)
2021-02-22HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1202&year=2021&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/2454H.02I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/2454H.03C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/2454H.03P.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/2454H03.02H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/2454H03.03H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/2454H03.04H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/2454H03.05H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/2454H03.06H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/2454H03.09H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/2454H03.10H.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB1202I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/2454H.02I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/2454H.03C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB1202C.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/2454H.03P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB1202P.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/061.001.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/063.007.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback