MO HB119 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a public water system to notify the Department of Natural Resources, the Department of Health and Senior Services, and its customers at least 90 days prior to a vote to cease fluoridation
Title
Requires a public water system to notify the Department of Natural Resources, the Department of Health and Senior Services, and its customers at least 90 days prior to a vote to cease fluoridation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - House - HB 119 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-03-18 - House - HB 119 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 152 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - HB 119 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 152 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 21, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment(S) |
2015-03-18 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-18 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 64 NOES: 91 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 152 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-18 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Agriculture(H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-23 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |