MO HB1181 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Hearing cancelled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Hearing cancelled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws based on executive branch reorganizations
Title
Changes the laws based on executive branch reorganizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Hearing cancelled. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 132 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1 |
2014-03-13 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-02-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2014-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-17 | House | Prefiled (H) |