MO HB1162 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates new provisions related to student data privacy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates new provisions related to student data privacy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2021-04-20HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2021-03-30HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-29HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-29HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-23HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-03-23HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-22HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-22HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-08HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-02-25HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2021-02-19HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-02-18HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback