MO HB1162 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that the Department of Economic Development shall maintain a record of all funds obtained under the "Broadband Internet Grant Program."
Title
Specifies that the Department of Economic Development shall maintain a record of all funds obtained under the "Broadband Internet Grant Program."
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Riggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - House: HB 1162 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, May 9, 2019, noon or upon morning recess whichever is later |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Second read and referred: Economic Development (S) |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-29 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-04-29 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-24 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-04-24 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-04-24 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-24 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2019-03-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |