MO HB1155 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to court proceedings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to court proceedings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-04-20HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-18HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-04-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-04-11HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-03-29HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2017-03-02HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-03-01HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback