MO HB115 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to the sale of intoxicating liquor in airports

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to the sale of intoxicating liquor in airports

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - House - House: HB 115 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 119 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: HB 115 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 124 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: HB 115 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 138 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-11HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2017-07-11HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2017-05-22HouseDelivered to Governor
2017-05-22HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2017-05-22HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2017-05-12HouseHouse Message (H)
2017-05-12HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 124 NOES: 19 PRESENT: 1
2017-05-12HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 119 NOES: 18 PRESENT: 1
2017-05-12HouseTaken Up
2017-05-12HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2017-05-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-05-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-05-11HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2017-05-11SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS
2017-05-11SenateThird Read and Passed (S)
2017-05-11SenateSS Adopted (S)
2017-05-11SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2017-05-11SenateTaken Up
2017-04-10SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2017-03-30SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2017-03-28SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2017-03-14SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-03-10SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 14, 2017, 12:00 p.m. or Upon Noon Recess, Senate Lounge
2017-03-09SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Economic Development(S)
2017-02-27HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-02-23HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 138 NOES: 16 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-23HouseTaken Up
2017-02-21HousePerfected (H)
2017-02-21HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2017-02-21HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2017-02-21HouseTaken Up
2017-02-09HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-02HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2017-02-02HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-01HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-01HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-25HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-10HouseReferred: Transportation(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2016-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB115&year=2017&code=R
Texthttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0485H.01I.pdf
Texthttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0485H.02C.pdf
Texthttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0485H.02P.pdf
Texthttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0485S.03C.pdf
Texthttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0485S.08F.pdf
Texthttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0485S.08T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/031.002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/Journals/RDay7005111795-1852.pdf#1842
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/073.031.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/073.030.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback