MO HB1135 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the termination of all administrative rules based on the time of promulgation and allows an agency to repromulgate a rule that is set to terminate
Title
Requires the termination of all administrative rules based on the time of promulgation and allows an agency to repromulgate a rule that is set to terminate
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-13 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-07-13 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-17 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 29 NAYS: 03 | |
2012-05-17 | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - YEAS: 29 NAYS: 003 | |
2012-05-17 | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) - YEAS: 29 NAYS: 03 | |
2012-05-16 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 142 NOES: 11 | |
2012-05-16 | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 8 | |
2012-05-15 | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) | |
2012-05-10 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - DIXON, CUNNINGHAM, RIDGEWAY, GREEN AND KEAVENY | |
2012-05-10 | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - SMITH(150), MCNARY, FRAKER, LAMPE, MCCANN-BEATTY | |
2012-05-10 | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) | |
2012-05-07 | House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference | |
2012-05-03 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SCS AS AMENDED | |
2012-05-03 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 2 ADOPTED YEAS: 33 NAYS: OO | |
2012-05-03 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2012-05-03 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-05-02 | Placed on Informal Calendar - SCS/SA 1 PENDING | |
2012-05-02 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-05-02 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-02 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2012-05-02 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-05-01 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MAY 2, 2:45PM, PERSHING CONFERENCE ROOM | |
2012-04-30 | Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2012-04-26 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-19 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-11 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 11, NOON, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-03-01 | Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government (S) | |
2012-01-25 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-01-25 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 102 NOES: 57 | |
2012-01-25 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-24 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2012-01-24 | Perfected (H) - AYES: 105 NOES: 54 | |
2012-01-24 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-01-23 | Laid Over (H) | |
2012-01-23 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-11 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-01-11 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-01-11 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-01-11 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-10 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Referred: Downsizing State Government (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |