MO HB1133 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the state income tax brackets.
Title
Modifies the state income tax brackets.
Sponsors
Rep. Vic Allred [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2019-03-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1133&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/2365H.01I.pdf |