MO HB1132 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding a tax credit for contributions to a maternity home, pregnancy resource center, or a food pantry

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding a tax credit for contributions to a maternity home, pregnancy resource center, or a food pantry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-10SenateSenate Message (S)
2014-09-10SenatePassed over Veto (G)
2014-09-10SenateTaken Up
2014-09-10HouseReported to The Senate (S)
2014-09-10HousePassed over Veto (G) - AYES: 123 NOES: 37
2014-09-10HouseTaken Up
2014-07-09HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2014-07-09HouseVetoed by Governor (G)
2014-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2014-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2014-05-07HouseHouse Message (H)
2014-05-07HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 121 NOES: 25
2014-05-07HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 122 NOES: 25
2014-05-07HouseTaken Up
2014-04-30SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS
2014-04-30SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 1
2014-04-30SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2014-04-30SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2014-04-30SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2014-04-30SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
2014-04-29SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 30, 2014, 1:15pm, Senate Committee Room 1
2014-04-28SenateReferred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
2014-04-23SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2014-04-16SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2014-04-16SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2014-04-09SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2014-04-07SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April9, 2014, Noon or upon Noon recess, Senate Lounge
2014-03-27SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S)
2014-03-13HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2014-03-13HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 113 NOES: 36
2014-03-13HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2014-03-13HouseReported Do Pass (H)
2014-03-13HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2014-03-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-03-12HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2014-03-12HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 118 NOES: 30
2014-03-12HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-03-10HouseRules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-03-10HouseRules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-03-10HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2014-03-05HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2014-03-05HouseReported Do Pass (H)
2014-02-04HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2014-02-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-01-28HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2014-01-09HouseReferred: Ways and Means(H)
2014-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2014-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2013-12-06HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback