MO HB113 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the court to depart from minimum sentencing provisions in certain circumstances.
Title
Allows the court to depart from minimum sentencing provisions in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: HB 113 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 140 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: HB 113 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 140 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-05-17 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS #3 as amended |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Taken Up |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2019-05-17 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) - SS#3 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Taken Up |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SCS, SS#2 for SCS and SA 1, pending |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | SS Withdrawn (S) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Taken Up |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, /SA 2, SSA 1 FOR SA 2, SS |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Taken Up |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, April 29, 2019, 3:30pm, Bingham Conference Room |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 16, 2019, 12:00pm or upon morning recess, SCR 2 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2019-02-21 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-02-21 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 140 NOES: 17 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-21 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-19 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-02-19 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |