MO HB1124 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to real estate licensees and advertisements
Title
Modifies provisions relating to real estate licensees and advertisements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |