MO HB1122 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the law regarding the treatment of pregnant prisoners.
Title
Changes the law regarding the treatment of pregnant prisoners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice(H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |