MO HB1120 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-17 - Withdrawn (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-17 - Withdrawn (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation to add the words "Missouri Expresses Its Gratitude To Military Personnel For Their Service" to the "Welcome to Missouri" signs located on interstate highways
Title
Requires the Department of Transportation to add the words "Missouri Expresses Its Gratitude To Military Personnel For Their Service" to the "Welcome to Missouri" signs located on interstate highways
Sponsors
Rep. Don Wells [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-17 | Withdrawn (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-22 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1120&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1120I.htm |