MO HB1103 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the maintenance of private roads and real estate appraisers and appraisal management companies
Title
Changes the laws regarding the maintenance of private roads and real estate appraisers and appraisal management companies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-07-12 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-16 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 0 | |
2012-05-16 | House Concurs (H) - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED AYES: 142 NOES: 0 | |
2012-05-03 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SA 1, SA 2 | |
2012-05-03 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED YEAS: 33 NAYS: 01 | |
2012-05-03 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-04-19 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-19 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-03-27 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-03-22 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, MARCH 26, 2012, 2:00PM,SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-03-08 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2012-02-20 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) - AYES: 151 NOES: 000 | |
2012-02-20 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred: Financial Institutions (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-20 | Prefiled (H) |