MO HB11 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-16 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-16 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the offense of endangering the welfare of a child in the first degree
Title
Modifies the offense of endangering the welfare of a child in the first degree
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: HB 11 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 117 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: HB 11 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 111 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: HB 11 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 92 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: HB 11 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 54 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2020-08-24 - House - House: HB 11 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 59 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2020-08-24 - House - House: HB 11 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 88 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: HB 11 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 117 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: HB 11 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 111 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: HB 11 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 92 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: HB 11 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 54 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2020-08-24 - House - House: HB 11 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 59 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2020-08-24 - House - House: HB 11 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 88 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-09-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-09-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-09-09 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SA 1 |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 29 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 adopted AYES: 29 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, September 2, 2020, Senate Chamber, 9:30a.m. |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 11:00 a.m., Tuesday, September 1, 2020, Senate Chamber |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) |
2020-08-28 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-08-25 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 111 NOES: 39 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-08-25 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 117 NOES: 33 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-08-25 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-08-25 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2020-08-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-08-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-08-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-08-24 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-08-24 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-08-24 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-08-24 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-08-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-08-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-08-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-08-17 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-08-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-08-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-08-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-08-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-08-12 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2020-08-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-07-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |