MO HB1098 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-08 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to telehealth services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to telehealth services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-08HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2023-05-02HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2023-05-01HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2023-05-01HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2023-04-12HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2023-04-04HouseReferred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H)
2023-02-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2023-02-08HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback