MO HB108 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a two-year statute of limitations for actions against a mental health professional for malpractice, negligence, error, or mistake
Title
Establishes a two-year statute of limitations for actions against a mental health professional for malpractice, negligence, error, or mistake
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - House - HB 108 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 7, 2015. 12:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2015-03-18 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 154 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-18 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-25 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |