MO HB1068 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the offense of unlawful possession of a firearm

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the offense of unlawful possession of a firearm

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-04-04HousePublic Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
2017-03-29HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2017-03-01HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-02-28HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback