MO HB1068 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the offense of unlawful possession of a firearm
Title
Modifies the offense of unlawful possession of a firearm
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |