MO HB1065 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to criminal offenses.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. David Evans [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2019-02-27 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |