MO HB1064 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Executive Session Held (S)
Pending: Senate Governmental Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions of the Personal Privacy Protection Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions of the Personal Privacy Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-11 - House - House: HB 1064 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 27 NV: 20 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: HB 1064 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 109 N: 35 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-27SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2023-04-25SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - AMENDED: Thursday, April 27, 2023, April 27, 2023, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
2023-04-25SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 27, 2023, April 27, 2023, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
2023-04-20SenateSecond read and referred: Governmental Accountability(S)
2023-04-11HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2023-04-11HouseEmergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 35 PRESENT: 9
2023-04-11HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 105 NOES: 27 PRESENT: 20
2023-04-11HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2023-04-11HousePlaced on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
2023-04-05HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted.
2023-04-05HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2023-04-05HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2023-04-05HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2023-04-03HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2023-04-03HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2023-04-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2023-03-27HouseReferred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H)
2023-03-21HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2023-03-20HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2023-03-20HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2023-02-27HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2023-02-15HouseReferred: Special Committee on Government Accountability(H)
2023-02-08HouseRead Second Time (H)
2023-02-07HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1064&year=2023&code=R
Texthttp://reflect.legiscan.com/Proxy.php
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/amendpdf/1926H06.04H.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/sumpdf/HB1064I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/fiscal/fispdf/1926H.02I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/fiscal/fispdf/1926H.06C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/sumpdf/HB1064C.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/fiscal/fispdf/1926H.06P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/sumpdf/HB1064P.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/rollcalls/051.007.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/rollcalls/051.006.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback