MO HB106 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to immunity of real estate licensees.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to immunity of real estate licensees.
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House: HB 106 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 29, 2019, 2 p.m., Senate Lounge |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Second read and referred: Professional Registration(S) |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-11 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-09 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-09 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |