MO HB1058 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires licensed child care facilities to report to the Department of Health and Senior Services and update annually their current liability insurance coverage information
Title
Requires licensed child care facilities to report to the Department of Health and Senior Services and update annually their current liability insurance coverage information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1058&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/1475H.01I.pdf |