MO HB105 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the "Private College Campus Protection Act" which allows private institutions of higher education to appoint persons to be members of a campus police department

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the "Private College Campus Protection Act" which allows private institutions of higher education to appoint persons to be members of a campus police department

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House: HB 105 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2019-04-17HouseHCS#2 Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2019-04-15HouseHCS#2 Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-04-15HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-04-08HouseAction Postponed (H)
2019-04-08HouseExecutive Session Continued
2019-04-01HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-03-12HouseRe-committed to Committee: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
2019-03-12HouseMotion to Recommit Adopted
2019-03-12HouseMotion to Recommit - Committee on Crime Prevention and Public Safety
2019-03-12HouseTaken Up
2019-03-12HouseHolds Place on the Calendar (H) - HA 2 adopted
2019-03-12HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-03-12HouseTaken Up
2019-03-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-27HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2019-02-27HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-25HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-25HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-11HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-16HouseReferred: Higher Education(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-12-03HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback