MO HB1049 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to health benefits plans that provide medical care or benefits through insurance for minor children.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to health benefits plans that provide medical care or benefits through insurance for minor children.
Sponsors
Rep. David Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House: HB 1049 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S) |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-05-01 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-05-01 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-29 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-04-29 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-29 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 28 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |