MO HB104 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Bonding Review Board" to determine whether sufficient financial assets exist to back individual sureties and to rate providers of individual sureties.
Title
Establishes the "Bonding Review Board" to determine whether sufficient financial assets exist to back individual sureties and to rate providers of individual sureties.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Green [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB104&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0213H.01I.pdf |