MO HB1035 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding political subdivisions
Title
Changes the laws regarding political subdivisions
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelley [R] | Rep. Pat Conway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Senate Votes to Override Veto (S) |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Senate Votes to Override Veto (S) |
2013-09-11 | Senate | House Message (H) |
2013-09-11 | Senate | House Votes to Override Veto (H) - AYES: 117 NOES: 44 |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 31 NOES: 1 |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 NOES: 1 |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 1 |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2013-05-17 | House | Reported to The Senate (S) |
2013-05-17 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 144 |
2013-05-17 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 |
2013-05-17 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 137 |
2013-05-15 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2013-05-14 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2013-05-13 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES KELLEY(127), CURTMAN, SWEARINGEN |
2013-05-09 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SCHMITT, PEARCE, DIXON, MCKENNA, HOLSMAN |
2013-05-09 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2013-05-09 | House | House Requests Senate Recede or Grant Conference (H) |
2013-05-09 | House | House Refuses to Adopt (C) |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS AS AMENDED |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 31 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, S A 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 7, SA 8, SA 9 ADOPTED AYES: 32 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 1, 2013, 12:00 p.m. or Upon Morning Recess, Senate Lounge. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S) |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-22 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 159 |
2013-04-22 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-17 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2013-04-17 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2013-04-17 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-04-11 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-11 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-11 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-04-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2013-04-03 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-04-02 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |