MO HB1029 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies state treasurer’s authority to invest in linked deposits.
Title
Modifies state treasurer’s authority to invest in linked deposits.
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Bondon [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House: HB 1029 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 144 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 1, 2019, 1:15pm, Pershing Conference Room |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 17, 2019, 12:00 pm, or upon morning recess, SCR 2 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S) |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-04-04 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-03-27 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-03-27 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-03-27 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |