MO HB1017 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-08 - Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Extends the sunset of the Second Injury Fund supplemental surcharge collected by the Division of Workers' Compensation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the sunset of the Second Injury Fund supplemental surcharge collected by the Division of Workers' Compensation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-08HouseReferred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H)
2023-04-27HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2023-04-27HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2023-04-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2023-04-25HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2023-04-20HouseReferred: Special Committee on Public Policy(H)
2023-02-02HouseRead Second Time (H)
2023-02-01HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback