MO HB1015 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Regarding law enforcement practices

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding law enforcement practices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-29 - House - House: HB 1015 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 12 NV: 27 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2023-04-26SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2023-04-26SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2023-04-19SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2023-04-17SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 19, 2023, 8:15 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1
2023-04-13SenateSecond read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
2023-03-30HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2023-03-29HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 108 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 27
2023-03-29HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2023-03-27HousePerfected (H)
2023-03-27HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2023-03-27HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2023-03-27HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2023-03-27HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2023-03-20HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2023-03-20HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2023-03-20HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2023-03-09HouseAction Postponed (H)
2023-03-09HouseExecutive Session Continued
2023-03-07HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2023-03-07HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2023-03-07HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2023-03-07HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2023-02-28HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2023-02-09HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2023-02-02HouseRead Second Time (H)
2023-02-01HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1015&year=2023&code=R
Texthttp://reflect.legiscan.com/Proxy.php
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/hlrbillspdf/2287S.04C.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/amendpdf/2287H02.01H.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/sumpdf/HB1015I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/fiscal/fispdf/2287H.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/sumpdf/HB1015C.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/fiscal/fispdf/2287H.02C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/sumpdf/HB1015P.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/fiscal/fispdf/2287H.02P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/fiscal/fispdf/2287S.04C.ORG.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/rollcalls/045.005.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback