MO HB1013 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-08 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-08 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to pooled estate accounts by public administrators and venue in guardianship and conservatorship cases
Title
Modifies provisions relating to pooled estate accounts by public administrators and venue in guardianship and conservatorship cases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-04-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2023-02-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-02-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |