MO HB101 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law relating to the REAL ID Act of 2005.
Title
Modifies provisions of law relating to the REAL ID Act of 2005.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Green [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB101&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0198H.01I.pdf |