MO HB1006 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Second read and referred: Government Reform(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Second read and referred: Government Reform(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits public bodies from entering into certain contracts.
Title
Prohibits public bodies from entering into certain contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - House - House: HB 1006 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 92 N: 55 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: HB 1006 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 49 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - House: HB 1006 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 93 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: HB 1006 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 83 N: 49 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: HB 1006 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 49 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - House: HB 1006 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 93 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: HB 1006 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 83 N: 49 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Second read and referred: Government Reform(S) |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-05-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 92 NOES: 55 PRESENT: 3 |
2019-05-13 | House | Taken Up |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-05-01 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2019-05-01 | House | Motion to Reconsider Defeated (H) - The vote by which the title was agreed to |
2019-05-01 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-05-01 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |