MN SF980 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Motion did not prevail to re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy Elections
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Motion did not prevail to re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy Elections
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education facilities authority rename as Minnesota Health and Education Facilities Authority; health care facilities construction and finance authority; bond capacity increase
Title
Higher education facilities authority rename as Minnesota Health and Education Facilities Authority; health care facilities construction and finance authority; bond capacity increase
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | Motion did not prevail to re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy Elections |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Chief author added Nelson |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Tomassoni |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1101 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy