MN SF979 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Senate file first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Senate file first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Child care training timelines extension and clarification
Title
Child care training timelines extension and clarification
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] | Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Jerry Relph [R] | Sen. Paul Utke [R] |
Sen. Julie Rosen [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-28 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
2020-04-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Special Order |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Family Care and Aging |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2048 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division