MN SF919 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3833
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3833
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Older and vulnerable adults financial exploitation protection establishment
Title
Older and vulnerable adults financial exploitation protection establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] |
Sen. Eric Pratt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3833 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Author added Pratt |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Authors added Eken; Newton |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Aging and Long-Term Care Policy |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3833 (Similar To) 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 161